Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/18/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-209. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2012 Signed by President.
12/12/2012 Presented to President.
12/10/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7706)
08/01/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5613-5614)
10/13/2011 Introduced in House