Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/25/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/25/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/07/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/07/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/24/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/29/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/18/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/18/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/20/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/18/2012