Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/15/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/19/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/17/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/31/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/06/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/08/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/27/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/06/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/29/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/05/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/10/2012