Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/13/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 10/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/13/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/13/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 10/13/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 10/13/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/14/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/14/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/27/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/27/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/27/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/27/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/27/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/02/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/14/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/16/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/01/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/20/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/23/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/17/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/17/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/24/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 01/27/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/27/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 01/27/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/31/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/31/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/01/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/06/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/08/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/08/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/09/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/09/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/14/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/29/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/21/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/24/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/16/2012