Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 10/14/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/02/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/08/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/20/2012