Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/01/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012