Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/27/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/13/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/31/2012