Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012