Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/11/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/02/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/02/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/02/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/18/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/18/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/26/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/15/2012