Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/27/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/24/2012