Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/24/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/27/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/27/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/27/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/01/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/02/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/02/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/02/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/02/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/07/2011