There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 170 Evergreen Square SW in Pine City, Minnesota, as the "Master Sergeant Daniel L. Fedder Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/05/2012Became Public Law No: 112-125. (TXT | PDF)
06/05/2012Signed by President.
05/29/2012Presented to President.
05/17/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3291-3292)
05/16/2012Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
12/12/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 351 - 0 (Roll no. 913).(text: CR H8325)
10/14/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
06/05/2012Became Public Law No: 112-125. (TXT | PDF)
06/05/2012Signed by President.
05/29/2012HousePresented to President.
05/17/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/17/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3291-3292)
05/16/2012SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 402.
05/16/2012SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
05/16/2012SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/14/2012SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
12/13/2011SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
12/12/2011-6:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2011-6:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 351 - 0 (Roll no. 913). (text: CR H8325)
12/12/2011-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8340)
12/12/2011-4:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/12/2011-4:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3220.
12/12/2011-4:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8325-8326)
12/12/2011-4:23pmHouseMr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/03/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
11/03/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/14/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
10/14/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform10/14/2011 Referred to
11/03/2011 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/13/2011 Referred to
05/16/2012 Markup by
05/16/2012 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security03/14/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3220.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3220. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-125 (06/05/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 170 Evergreen Square SW in Pine City, Minnesota, as the "Master Sergeant Daniel L. Fedder Post Office."