Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/07/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/16/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/28/2012