Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/24/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 11/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/14/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/06/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2011