Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 12/07/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/06/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/08/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/15/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/15/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/29/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/07/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/20/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/09/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/07/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 08/07/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/10/2012