Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 10/26/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/01/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/18/2012