Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/27/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/18/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/29/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/30/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/02/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/02/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 12/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/16/2011