Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/31/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/13/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/08/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/13/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 02/17/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/21/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/27/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/27/2012