Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/02/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/02/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/07/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/07/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/07/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/07/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/07/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/14/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/29/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/29/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/29/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/01/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/26/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2012