Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/01/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/03/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/03/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/15/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/06/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/16/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/31/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 01/31/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/31/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/22/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 08/01/2012