Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/02/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/01/2011