Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/13/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/13/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/31/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/26/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/26/2012