Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/01/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/01/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/03/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/03/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/03/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/03/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/03/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/03/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/03/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/03/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/03/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/03/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/03/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/03/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/03/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/04/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/04/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/14/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/07/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/07/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/18/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/31/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/14/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/06/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/16/2012