Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/05/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/25/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/14/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/05/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/09/2012