Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/18/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/29/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/29/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/30/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/30/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2012