Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/18/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/30/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 12/20/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/02/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/17/2012