Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/02/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/02/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 11/04/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/25/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/02/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/07/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/15/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/23/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/23/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/23/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/13/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/18/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/18/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/24/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/24/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/01/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/29/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/23/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/05/2012