Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/19/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 01/19/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/24/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/24/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/24/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/24/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/24/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/24/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/26/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/26/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/26/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/11/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/17/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/28/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/28/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/08/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/17/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/13/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/13/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/11/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/11/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/11/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/11/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/11/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/11/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/14/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/21/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/01/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/01/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/14/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/14/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/14/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/14/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 03/06/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/06/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/17/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/17/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 08/01/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/01/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 08/02/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/10/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/19/2012