Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/13/2012