Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/18/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/24/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/25/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/25/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/25/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 01/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/07/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/17/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/06/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/31/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/31/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/31/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/07/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/07/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/07/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/09/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/10/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/18/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 07/30/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/12/2012