Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/28/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/01/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/06/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/26/2012