Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/03/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/15/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/15/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/18/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/18/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/29/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/29/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/29/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/29/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/02/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/20/2011