Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/25/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/25/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/31/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/19/2012