Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/29/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/29/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/29/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/19/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/19/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/26/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/03/2012