Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/17/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/17/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/14/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/24/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/24/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/15/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/06/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/20/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/20/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/12/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/21/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/30/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/30/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/30/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew