Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/06/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/15/2012