Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/17/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/18/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/29/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/23/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/23/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/23/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/23/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/06/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/06/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/07/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/20/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/21/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/21/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/21/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/22/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/22/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/22/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/26/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/28/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/29/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/30/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/08/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/10/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/10/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/15/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/15/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/25/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/25/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/25/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/10/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/16/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/16/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/16/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/18/2012