Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/04/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/04/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/29/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 12/15/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/23/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/31/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/15/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/29/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/06/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/30/2012