Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 11/04/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/02/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/16/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 12/16/2011