Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 11/04/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/18/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/13/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/08/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/09/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/22/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/26/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/08/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/09/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/17/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/17/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/17/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/17/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/08/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/10/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/12/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/24/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/31/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/19/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 10/19/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/05/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/02/2013