Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/18/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/18/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 12/02/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 12/02/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/06/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/06/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/06/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/06/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 12/08/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/08/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 12/08/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/15/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/27/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/27/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/27/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/17/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/17/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/23/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/24/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/31/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/16/2012