Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/17/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/14/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/15/2012
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/15/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/01/2012