Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/16/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/22/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/22/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/22/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/22/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/22/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/22/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/01/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/01/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 01/18/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/24/2012