Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/14/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/14/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/17/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2012