Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/15/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/22/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 12/19/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/01/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/01/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/02/2012