Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/15/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 11/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 11/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 11/15/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/05/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/05/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/05/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/08/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/08/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/12/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/09/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/20/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/27/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/09/2012