Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 11/15/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/26/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/10/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/26/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/31/2012