Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/19/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/26/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/11/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/16/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/28/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/02/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/20/2011