Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/16/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/16/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/29/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/01/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/13/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/24/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2012