Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/02/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/06/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 12/08/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/08/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/06/2012